NE LB127 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM646 filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change notice requirements under Open Meetings Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change notice requirements under Open Meetings Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-17LegislatureGovernment, Military and Veterans Affairs AM646 filed
2017-03-17LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM646
2017-01-25LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 02, 2017
2017-01-10LegislatureReferred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
2017-01-06LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback