NE LB127 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change sentencing provisions for crimes committed by a person under eighteen years of age
Title
Change sentencing provisions for crimes committed by a person under eighteen years of age
Sponsors
Sen. Jen Day [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-03-08 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 15, 2023 |
2023-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-01-06 | Legislature | Date of introduction |