NE LB1262 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change and eliminate provisions relating to the Commission on Indian Affairs and provide for an ongoing study relating to Native American voting issues
Title
Change and eliminate provisions relating to the Commission on Indian Affairs and provide for an ongoing study relating to Native American voting issues
Sponsors
Sen. Jen Day [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-02-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 28, 2024 |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2024-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |