NE LB1259 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1259 amended into LB750 by AM1966
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1259 amended into LB750 by AM1966
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to issuance of new license plates and license plate fees
Title
Change provisions relating to issuance of new license plates and license plate fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1259 amended into LB750 by AM1966 |
2022-03-31 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2022 |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |