NE LB1254 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1254 amended into LB1014 by AM2330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1254 amended into LB1014 by AM2330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate federal funds to the Department of Health and Human Services for services relating to youth who have aged out of the foster care system
Title
Appropriate federal funds to the Department of Health and Human Services for services relating to youth who have aged out of the foster care system
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Hansen [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1254 amended into LB1014 by AM2330 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 25, 2022 |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |