NE LB123 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for reimbursement when certain postsecondary institutions terminate operations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for reimbursement when certain postsecondary institutions terminate operations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2018-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB123 amended into LB512 by AM724
2017-01-17LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 24, 2017
2017-01-10LegislatureReferred to Education Committee
2017-01-06LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback