NE LB1208 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allow for detention of juveniles under the Nebraska Juvenile Code for their own protection
Title
Allow for detention of juveniles under the Nebraska Juvenile Code for their own protection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-02-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 23, 2024 |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |