NE LB117 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Approved by Governor on April 19, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Investigational Drug Use Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Investigational Drug Use Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 35-13-1 (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 19, 2018
2018-04-18LegislaturePresented to Governor on April 18, 2018
2018-04-18LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2018-04-18LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 35-13-1
2018-04-10LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading with ST70
2018-04-10LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2018-04-10LegislatureKuehn AM2911 adopted
2018-04-10LegislatureKuehn AM2911 filed
2018-04-10LegislatureKuehn AM2877 withdrawn
2018-04-10LegislatureKuehn AM2876 withdrawn
2018-04-10LegislatureKuehn AM2866 withdrawn
2018-04-10LegislatureKuehn AM2867 withdrawn
2018-04-10LegislatureHilgers FA148 withdrawn
2018-04-10LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER117 adopted
2018-04-09LegislatureKuehn AM2877 filed
2018-04-09LegislatureKuehn AM2876 filed
2018-04-06LegislatureKuehn AM2866 filed
2018-04-06LegislatureKuehn AM2867 filed
2018-04-06LegislatureHilgers FA148 filed
2018-03-28LegislatureAttorney General Opinion 18-002 to Hilgers
2018-03-06LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER117 filed
2018-03-06LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER117
2018-03-01LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2018-03-01LegislatureKuehn MO238 failed
2018-03-01LegislatureKuehn MO238 Bracket until April 18, 2018 filed
2018-03-01LegislatureChambers MO237 withdrawn
2018-03-01LegislatureChambers MO237 Bracket until April 4, 2018 filed
2018-03-01LegislatureHealth and Human Services AM46 adopted
2018-02-21LegislatureSpeaker priority bill
2018-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2017-04-24LegislatureKolterman name added
2017-03-15LegislatureHealth and Human Services AM46 filed
2017-03-15LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM46
2017-01-18LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 27, 2017
2017-01-10LegislatureReferred to Health and Human Services Committee
2017-01-06LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback