NE LB1167 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 15, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 15, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to individuals arrested without a warrant
Title
Change provisions relating to individuals arrested without a warrant
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 40-1-8 (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Legislature - DeBoer AM3118 adopted (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Legislature - Judiciary AM2829 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Legislature - DeBoer AM3118 adopted (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Legislature - Judiciary AM2829 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 15, 2024 |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 11, 2024 |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 40-1-8 |
2024-04-02 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2024-03-26 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2024-03-26 | Legislature | DeBoer AM3118 adopted |
2024-03-26 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER96 adopted |
2024-03-19 | Legislature | DeBoer AM3118 to AM2829 filed |
2024-03-19 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER96 filed |
2024-03-19 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER96 |
2024-03-14 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2024-03-14 | Legislature | DeBoer AM2281 withdrawn |
2024-03-14 | Legislature | Judiciary AM2829 adopted |
2024-03-07 | Legislature | Judiciary AM2829 filed |
2024-03-07 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2829 |
2024-02-01 | Legislature | DeBoer AM2281 filed |
2024-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2024 |
2024-01-16 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |