NE LB1163 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Provisions/Portions of LB1163 amended into LB928 by AM2667
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Provisions/Portions of LB1163 amended into LB928 by AM2667
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for a deer donation program and for redistribution of deer permit fees
Title
Provide for a deer donation program and for redistribution of deer permit fees
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Fulton [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Provisions/Portions of LB1163 amended into LB928 by AM2667 | |
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-01-26 | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2012 | |
2012-01-23 | Referred to Natural Resources Committee | |
2012-01-19 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=16051 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB1163.pdf |