NE LB1158 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to parental involvement in and access to learning materials in schools and provide for withholding of funding from school districts
Title
Change provisions relating to parental involvement in and access to learning materials in schools and provide for withholding of funding from school districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-04-05 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO216 Bracket until April 20, 2022 filed |
2022-03-09 | Legislature | Education AM2143 filed |
2022-03-09 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2143 |
2022-02-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 15, 2022 |
2022-01-31 | Legislature | Sanders priority bill |
2022-01-21 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2022-01-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |