NE LB1125 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State intent to appropriate funds to the Department of Health and Human Services
Title
State intent to appropriate funds to the Department of Health and Human Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-31 | Legislature | Conrad name added |
2024-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 12, 2024 |
2024-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 15, 2024 (cancel) |
2024-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 15, 2024 |
2024-01-16 | Legislature | McDonnell name added |
2024-01-11 | Legislature | Ibach name added |
2024-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2024-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |