NE LB1120 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - DeKay explanation of vote
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - DeKay explanation of vote
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Require affidavits for certain purchases of real property near military installations
Title
Require affidavits for certain purchases of real property near military installations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Legislature - Hardin AM3029 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Legislature - Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM2519 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Legislature - Hardin AM2773 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Legislature - Hardin AM3029 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Legislature - Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM2519 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Legislature - Hardin AM2773 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | DeKay explanation of vote |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 16, 2024 |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 11, 2024 |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. FA333 withdrawn |
2024-04-02 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. FA333 filed |
2024-04-02 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2024-03-25 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2024-03-25 | Legislature | Hardin AM3029 adopted |
2024-03-25 | Legislature | Hardin AM2952 withdrawn |
2024-03-25 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER82 adopted |
2024-03-18 | Legislature | Hardin AM3029 to ER82 filed |
2024-03-14 | Legislature | Hardin AM2952 to ER82 filed |
2024-03-13 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER82 filed |
2024-03-13 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER82 |
2024-03-05 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2024-03-05 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM2519 adopted |
2024-03-05 | Legislature | Hardin AM2773 adopted |
2024-02-29 | Legislature | Hardin AM2773 to AM2519 filed |
2024-02-21 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM2519 filed |
2024-02-21 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2519 |
2024-01-19 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 12, 2024 |
2024-01-16 | Legislature | Hardin priority bill |
2024-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2024-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |