NE LB112 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor on April 26, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor on April 26, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide exemptions from motor carrier regulations for certain transportation service providers
Title
Provide exemptions from motor carrier regulations for certain transportation service providers
Sponsors
Sen. Colby Coash [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Approved by Governor on April 26, 2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Presented to Governor on April 20, 2011 | |
2011-04-20 | President/Speaker signed | |
2011-04-20 | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3 | |
2011-04-20 | Dispensing of reading at large approved | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2011-04-12 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2011-04-12 | Coash AM1141 adopted | |
2011-04-12 | Lautenbaugh AM908 withdrawn | |
2011-04-12 | Enrollment and Review ER72 adopted | |
2011-04-11 | Coash AM1141 filed | |
2011-04-05 | Enrollment and Review ER72 filed | |
2011-04-05 | Placed on Select File with ER72 | |
2011-03-29 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2011-03-29 | Lautenbaugh AM908 refiled | |
2011-03-29 | Lautenbaugh AM908 withdrawn | |
2011-03-29 | Transportation and Telecommunications AM361 adopted | |
2011-03-23 | Lautenbaugh AM908 filed | |
2011-03-08 | Transportation and Telecommunications priority bill | |
2011-02-16 | Transportation and Telecommunications AM361 filed | |
2011-02-16 | Placed on General File with AM361 | |
2011-01-14 | Notice of hearing for January 24, 2011 | |
2011-01-10 | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee | |
2011-01-06 | Date of introduction |