NE LB1114 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1114 amended into LB1012 by AM2000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1114 amended into LB1012 by AM2000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of the Business Innovation Act relating to purposes, funding preferences, and the small business investment program
Title
Change provisions of the Business Innovation Act relating to purposes, funding preferences, and the small business investment program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1114 amended into LB1012 by AM2000 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 08, 2022 |
2022-01-26 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |