NE LB1110 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change concealed handgun permit renewal provisions for members of the armed forces and their spouses
Title
Change concealed handgun permit renewal provisions for members of the armed forces and their spouses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-02-26 | Legislature | Pirsch name added |
2014-02-19 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 26, 2014 |
2014-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2014-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=21899 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB1110.pdf |