NE LB1095 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create the Tax-increment Financing Division of the Department of Economic Development and change the Community Development Law
Title
Create the Tax-increment Financing Division of the Department of Economic Development and change the Community Development Law
Sponsors
Sen. Al Davis [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 11, 2014 |
2014-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 04, 2014 (cancel) |
2014-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 04, 2014 |
2014-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2014-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=22205 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB1095.pdf |