NE LB1088 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1088 amended into LB774 by AM2422
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1088 amended into LB774 by AM2422
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide a sales and use tax exemption for nonprofit centers for independent living
Title
Provide a sales and use tax exemption for nonprofit centers for independent living
Sponsors
Sen. Al Davis [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1088 amended into LB774 by AM2422 |
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-02-09 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 19, 2016 |
2016-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2016-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=28951 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB1088.pdf |