NE LB1085 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Tourism Development Act and provide for the transfer of state sales tax revenue
Title
Adopt the Tourism Development Act and provide for the transfer of state sales tax revenue
Sponsors
Sen. Burke Harr [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-01-31 | Notice of hearing for February 09, 2012 | |
2012-01-20 | Referred to Revenue Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=16042 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB1085.pdf |