NE LB1081 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1081 amended into LB1014 by AM2330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1081 amended into LB1014 by AM2330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for a grant program for the design, construction, and implementation of water transport infrastructure under the Department of Natural Resources and state intent to appropriate federal funds
Title
Provide for a grant program for the design, construction, and implementation of water transport infrastructure under the Department of Natural Resources and state intent to appropriate federal funds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1081 amended into LB1014 by AM2330 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-02-08 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 16, 2022 |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2022-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |