NE LB1080 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1080 amended into LB853 by AM2371
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1080 amended into LB853 by AM2371
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change homestead exemption provisions relating to qualifications, application requirements, and penalties
Title
Change homestead exemption provisions relating to qualifications, application requirements, and penalties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1080 amended into LB853 by AM2371 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-03-01 | Legislature | Revenue AM2039 filed |
2022-03-01 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2039 |
2022-02-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 24, 2022 |
2022-01-26 | Legislature | Day name added |
2022-01-26 | Legislature | Brewer name added |
2022-01-21 | Legislature | Arch name added |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2022-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |