NE LB1078 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1078 amended into LB1076 by AM2305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1078 amended into LB1076 by AM2305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change the Nebraska Telehealth Act, provide for the establishment of a patient relationship through video conferencing, and require insurance coverage for telehealth services
Title
Change the Nebraska Telehealth Act, provide for the establishment of a patient relationship through video conferencing, and require insurance coverage for telehealth services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1078 amended into LB1076 by AM2305 |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-03-04 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM2091 filed |
2014-03-04 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2091 |
2014-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 12, 2014 |
2014-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2014-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=21580 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB1078.pdf |