NE LB1075 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB1075 amended into LB1074 by AM2560
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB1075 amended into LB1074 by AM2560
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of the Delayed Deposit Services Licensing Act, the Nebraska Installment Loan Act, the Nebraska Installment Sales Act, the Nebraska Money Transmitters Act, and the Residential Mortgage Licensing Act
Title
Change provisions of the Delayed Deposit Services Licensing Act, the Nebraska Installment Loan Act, the Nebraska Installment Sales Act, the Nebraska Money Transmitters Act, and the Residential Mortgage Licensing Act
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Slama [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1075 amended into LB1074 by AM2560 |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2024 |
2024-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2024-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |