NE LB1074 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to individual income tax brackets and rates and the earned income tax credit
Title
Change provisions relating to individual income tax brackets and rates and the earned income tax credit
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Vargas [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2018 |
2018-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2018-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34743 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB1074.pdf |