NE LB1063 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate federal funds to the Department of Labor to increase the number of apprentices and provide premium pay
Title
Appropriate federal funds to the Department of Labor to increase the number of apprentices and provide premium pay
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 24, 2022 |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |