NE LB1061 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB1061 amended into LB262 by AM2654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB1061 amended into LB262 by AM2654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of the Nebraska Corn Resources Act
Title
Change provisions of the Nebraska Corn Resources Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1061 amended into LB262 by AM2654 |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-03-06 | Legislature | Erdman name withdrawn |
2024-02-14 | Legislature | Agriculture AM2426 filed |
2024-02-14 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2426 |
2024-02-05 | Legislature | Hansen name added |
2024-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2024 |
2024-01-16 | Legislature | Ballard name added |
2024-01-11 | Legislature | Jacobson name added |
2024-01-11 | Legislature | Lippincott name added |
2024-01-11 | Legislature | Clements name added |
2024-01-10 | Legislature | Hughes name added |
2024-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Agriculture Committee |
2024-01-09 | Legislature | DeKay name added |
2024-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |