NE LB1060 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Enrollment and Review ER208 filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Include hair textures and protective hairstyles within the definition of race under the Nebraska Fair Employment Practice Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Include hair textures and protective hairstyles within the definition of race under the Nebraska Fair Employment Practice Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-23LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER208 filed
2020-03-23LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER208
2020-03-12LegislatureChambers name added
2020-03-09LegislatureHunt name added
2020-03-09LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2020-03-09LegislatureBlood name added
2020-03-09LegislaturePending
2020-02-21LegislatureCavanaugh priority bill
2020-02-20LegislaturePlaced on General File
2020-01-24LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 03, 2020
2020-01-24LegislatureReferred to Business and Labor Committee
2020-01-21LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback