NE LB1056 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB980 amended into LB1056 by AM3001
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB980 amended into LB1056 by AM3001
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of the Nebraska Liquor Control Act and the Nebraska Lottery and Raffle Act
Title
Change provisions of the Nebraska Liquor Control Act and the Nebraska Lottery and Raffle Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Lowe [N] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Legislature - Lowe AM3158 adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Legislature - Briese AM3001 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Legislature - General Affairs AM2595 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Legislature - Lowe AM3158 adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Legislature - Briese AM3001 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Legislature - General Affairs AM2595 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB980 amended into LB1056 by AM3001 |
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on August 15, 2020 |
2020-08-12 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on August 11, 2020 |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2020-08-05 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2020-08-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-08-04 | Legislature | Wayne AM3154 withdrawn |
2020-08-04 | Legislature | Lowe AM3158 adopted |
2020-08-04 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER221 adopted |
2020-07-29 | Legislature | Wayne AM3154 filed |
2020-07-27 | Legislature | Lowe AM3158 filed |
2020-07-27 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER221 filed |
2020-07-27 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER221 |
2020-07-22 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-07-22 | Legislature | Briese AM3001 adopted |
2020-07-22 | Legislature | Briese AM3001 filed |
2020-07-22 | Legislature | Lowe AM2795 withdrawn |
2020-07-22 | Legislature | General Affairs AM2595 adopted |
2020-03-06 | Legislature | Lowe AM2795 pending |
2020-03-06 | Legislature | General Affairs AM2595 pending |
2020-03-05 | Legislature | Lowe AM2795 filed |
2020-03-03 | Legislature | General Affairs AM2595 filed |
2020-03-03 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2595 |
2020-02-20 | Legislature | General Affairs priority bill |
2020-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 03, 2020 |
2020-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to General Affairs Committee |
2020-01-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |