NE LB1054 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-27 - Approved by Governor on July 24, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-27 - Approved by Governor on July 24, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Define the required beginning date and change deferment of payment provisions under certain retirement plans
Title
Define the required beginning date and change deferment of payment provisions under certain retirement plans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-27 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on July 24, 2020 |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | Hilkemann explanation of vote |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on July 21, 2020 |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2020-02-25 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2020-02-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-02-12 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2020-02-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-02-06 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2020-01-27 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems priority bill |
2020-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2020 |
2020-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee |
2020-01-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
2020-01-21 | Legislature | Kolterman motion to suspend rules to permit introduction of bill prevailed |
2020-01-21 | Legislature | Kolterman motion to suspend rules to permit introduction of bill filed |