NE LB1054 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to hearings before the Nebraska Power Review Board and electric generation using wind
Title
Change provisions relating to hearings before the Nebraska Power Review Board and electric generation using wind
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Brewer AM2531 filed |
2018-03-09 | Legislature | Brewer AM2043 filed |
2018-02-01 | Legislature | Brewer AM1727 filed |
2018-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2018 |
2018-01-19 | Legislature | Brewer AM1578 filed |
2018-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2018-01-18 | Legislature | Brewer priority bill |
2018-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34567 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB1054.pdf |