NE LB1052 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 17, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Require instruction and teacher education related to dyslexia

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require instruction and teacher education related to dyslexia

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 17, 2018
2018-04-11LegislaturePresented to Governor on April 11, 2018
2018-04-11LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2018-04-11LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 44-0-5
2018-04-06LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2018-04-05LegislatureCorrection
2018-04-04LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2018-04-03LegislaturePlaced on Select File
2018-03-27LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2018-03-13LegislaturePlaced on General File
2018-02-15LegislatureErdman name added
2018-02-06LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 13, 2018
2018-01-19LegislatureReferred to Education Committee
2018-01-17LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback