NE LB1047 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by Governor on April 12, 2010
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by Governor on April 12, 2010
Summary
Provide for construction of terms in wills and trusts relating to federal laws
Title
Provide for construction of terms in wills and trusts relating to federal laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by Governor on April 12, 2010 | |
2010-04-12 | Nordquist explanation of vote | |
2010-04-12 | Presented to Governor on April 09, 2010 | |
2010-04-09 | President/Speaker signed | |
2010-04-09 | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2010-04-06 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2010-04-06 | Nelson FA74 withdrawn | |
2010-04-06 | Nelson FA74 filed | |
2010-04-06 | Enrollment and Review ER8228 adopted | |
2010-04-01 | Enrollment and Review ER8228 filed | |
2010-04-01 | Placed on Select File with ER8228 | |
2010-03-31 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2010-03-31 | Judiciary AM1812 adopted | |
2010-02-09 | Judiciary AM1812 filed | |
2010-02-09 | Placed on General File with AM1812 | |
2010-01-27 | Notice of hearing for February 03, 2010 | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-01-21 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=10046 |