NE LB1043 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely postponed
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely postponed
Summary
Change medical lien provisions and provide for discovery of medical treatment value and payment rights
Title
Change medical lien provisions and provide for discovery of medical treatment value and payment rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2010-02-18 | Notice of hearing for February 25, 2010 (rescheduled due to time change) | |
2010-02-18 | Notice of hearing for February 25, 2010 (cancel) | |
2010-02-17 | Notice of hearing for February 25, 2010 | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-01-21 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=10190 |