NE LB1042 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1041 amended into LB1042 by AM2132
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1041 amended into LB1042 by AM2132
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change school retirement provisions and duties of the Public Employees Retirement Board
Title
Change school retirement provisions and duties of the Public Employees Retirement Board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1041 amended into LB1042 by AM2132 |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 16, 2014 |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 10, 2014 |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST85 |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Chambers AM2826 withdrawn |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Nordquist AM2765 adopted |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER231 adopted |
2014-04-07 | Legislature | Chambers AM2826 filed |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | Nordquist AM2765 filed |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER231 filed |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER231 |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Nordquist AM2596 adopted |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems AM2132 adopted |
2014-03-26 | Legislature | Nordquist AM2596 filed |
2014-03-05 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems AM2132 filed |
2014-03-05 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2132 |
2014-02-06 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems priority bill |
2014-01-29 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 12, 2014 |
2014-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee |
2014-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |