NE LB1040 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely postponed
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely postponed
Summary
Adopt the Nebraska Municipal Comparability Act for use in industrial disputes involving public employees
Title
Adopt the Nebraska Municipal Comparability Act for use in industrial disputes involving public employees
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Fulton [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2010-02-11 | Notice of hearing for February 22, 2010 | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to Business and Labor Committee | |
2010-01-21 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=10014 |