NE LB1031 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely postponed
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely postponed
Summary
Change tax levy authority relating to natural resources districts
Title
Change tax levy authority relating to natural resources districts
Sponsors
Sen. Cap Dierks [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2010-03-01 | Revenue AM2040 filed | |
2010-03-01 | Placed on General File with AM2040 | |
2010-01-26 | Notice of hearing for February 18, 2010 | |
2010-01-22 | Referred to Revenue Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9750 |