NE LB1028 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1028 amended into LB1093 by AM2391
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1028 amended into LB1093 by AM2391
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to funding under the Business Innovation Act and require the Department of Economic Development to contract with certain entities
Title
Change provisions relating to funding under the Business Innovation Act and require the Department of Economic Development to contract with certain entities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1028 amended into LB1093 by AM2391 |
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2016 |
2016-01-21 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=28689 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB1028.pdf |