NE LB1024 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-30 - Bill withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-30 - Bill withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permit the Nebraska Tourism Commission to adopt an official state symbol or slogan
Title
Permit the Nebraska Tourism Commission to adopt an official state symbol or slogan
Sponsors
Sen. Heath Mello [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-30 | Legislature | Bill withdrawn |
2014-01-30 | Legislature | Mello MO122 prevailed |
2014-01-29 | Legislature | Mello MO122 Withdraw bill filed |
2014-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2014-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=21358 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB1024.pdf |