NE LB1020 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Approved by Governor on April 14, 2010
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Approved by Governor on April 14, 2010
Summary
Change provisions relating to benefit eligibility under the Employment Security Law
Title
Change provisions relating to benefit eligibility under the Employment Security Law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Approved by Governor on April 14, 2010 | |
2010-04-13 | Presented to Governor on April 13, 2010 | |
2010-04-13 | President/Speaker signed | |
2010-04-13 | Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 | |
2010-04-13 | Dispensing of reading at large approved | |
2010-04-13 | Correction | |
2010-04-09 | Placed on Final Reading with ST9109 | |
2010-04-09 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2010-04-09 | Lathrop AM2532 adopted | |
2010-04-09 | Lathrop AM2532 filed | |
2010-04-09 | Enrollment and Review ER8239 adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Enrollment and Review ER8239 filed | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on Select File with ER8239 | |
2010-04-08 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2010-04-08 | Lathrop FA77 adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Lathrop FA77 filed | |
2010-04-08 | Business and Labor AM2512 adopted | |
2010-04-07 | Business and Labor AM2512 filed | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on General File with AM2512 | |
2010-01-25 | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2010 | |
2010-01-22 | Referred to Business and Labor Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=10134 |