NE LB1018 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate funds to the Nebraska Arts Council
Title
Appropriate funds to the Nebraska Arts Council
Sponsors
Sen. Colby Coash [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 11, 2016 |
2016-01-21 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=28317 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB1018.pdf |