NE LB1014 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-27 - Approved by Governor on July 24, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions of the Multiple Employer Welfare Arrangement Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions of the Multiple Employer Welfare Arrangement Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-21 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Legislature - Lindstrom AM2449 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-27LegislatureApproved by Governor on July 24, 2020
2020-07-21LegislatureHilkemann explanation of vote
2020-07-21LegislaturePresented to Governor on July 21, 2020
2020-07-21LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2020-07-21LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 48-0-1
2020-03-11LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2020-03-06LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2020-02-25LegislaturePlaced on Select File
2020-02-21LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2020-02-21LegislatureLindstrom AM2449 adopted
2020-02-20LegislatureLindstrom AM2449 filed
2020-02-18LegislatureDorn priority bill
2020-02-11LegislaturePlaced on General File
2020-01-27LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 04, 2020
2020-01-21LegislatureReferred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee
2020-01-15LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback