NE LB1012 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 17, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 17, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize self-service storage facility operator insurance producer licenses
Title
Authorize self-service storage facility operator insurance producer licenses
Sponsors
Sen. Burke Harr [N] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | Thibodeau explanation of vote |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 |
2018-04-06 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST58 |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Harr AM2706 adopted |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Harr AM2706 filed |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER155 adopted |
2018-03-28 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER155 filed |
2018-03-28 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER155 |
2018-03-26 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-03-26 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM1691 adopted |
2018-02-07 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM1691 filed |
2018-02-07 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1691 |
2018-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2018 |
2018-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2018-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |