NE LB1009 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 17, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 17, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change a rural highway classification and maximum highway speed limits as prescribed
Title
Change a rural highway classification and maximum highway speed limits as prescribed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 44-1-4 (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 44-1-4 |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2018-03-28 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-03-28 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER138 adopted |
2018-03-23 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER138 filed |
2018-03-23 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER138 |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Smith AM2254 adopted |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM1737 adopted |
2018-03-07 | Legislature | Smith AM2254 filed |
2018-02-28 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM1737 filed |
2018-02-28 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1737 |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | Hughes priority bill |
2018-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2018 |
2018-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2018-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |