NE LB1008 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for utilization and treatment guidelines for medical services under the Nebraska Workers' Compensation Act
Title
Provide for utilization and treatment guidelines for medical services under the Nebraska Workers' Compensation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Fulton [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-01-23 | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2012 | |
2012-01-19 | Referred to Business and Labor Committee | |
2012-01-17 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=15967 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB1008.pdf |