NE LB1004 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1004 amended into LB1066 by AM2640
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1004 amended into LB1066 by AM2640
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the Community Eligibility Provision and provide duties for the State Department of Education
Title
Change provisions relating to the Community Eligibility Provision and provide duties for the State Department of Education
Sponsors
Sen. Tanya Cook [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1004 amended into LB1066 by AM2640 |
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-02-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 08, 2016 |
2016-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2016-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=28879 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB1004.pdf |