NE LB1003 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB993 amended into LB1003 by AM2651
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB993 amended into LB1003 by AM2651
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to cities and villages
Title
Change provisions relating to cities and villages
Sponsors
Sen. Lynne Walz [N] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-31 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 42-1-6 (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Legislature - Urban Affairs AM2651 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Legislature - Urban Affairs AM2651 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB993 amended into LB1003 by AM2651 |
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB984 amended into LB1003 by AM2651 |
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB957 amended into LB1003 by AM2651 |
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB885 amended into LB1003 by AM2651 |
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB821 amended into LB1003 by AM2651 |
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB801 amended into LB1003 by AM2651 |
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB799 amended into LB1003 by AM2651 |
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB795 amended into LB1003 by AM2651 |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on August 06, 2020 |
2020-08-03 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on July 31, 2020 |
2020-07-31 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-07-31 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 42-1-6 |
2020-07-31 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2020-07-22 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER217 adopted |
2020-03-23 | Legislature | Vargas name added |
2020-03-23 | Legislature | Hansen, M. name added |
2020-03-23 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER217 filed |
2020-03-23 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER217 |
2020-03-11 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-03-11 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM2651 adopted |
2020-03-06 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM2651 filed |
2020-03-06 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2651 |
2020-02-21 | Legislature | Wayne name added |
2020-02-21 | Legislature | Urban Affairs priority bill |
2020-02-19 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2020-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 18, 2020 |
2020-01-21 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2020-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |