NE LB1002 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1184 amended into LB1002 by AM2774
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions regarding emergency medical services, medical nutrition therapy, juvenile psychiatric units and facilities, and wholesale drug distribution

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions regarding emergency medical services, medical nutrition therapy, juvenile psychiatric units and facilities, and wholesale drug distribution

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM2774 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-18LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB1184 amended into LB1002 by AM2774
2020-08-18LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB1044 amended into LB1002 by AM2774
2020-08-18LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB893 amended into LB1002 by AM2774
2020-08-18LegislatureApproved by Governor on August 15, 2020
2020-08-12LegislaturePresented to Governor on August 11, 2020
2020-08-11LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2020-08-11LegislaturePassed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2
2020-08-11LegislatureDispensing of reading at large approved
2020-08-05LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading with ST72
2020-08-04LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2020-08-04LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER235 adopted
2020-07-28LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER235 filed
2020-07-28LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER235
2020-07-27LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2020-07-27LegislatureHealth and Human Services AM2774 adopted
2020-03-12LegislatureHealth and Human Services AM2774 filed
2020-03-12LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM2774
2020-02-20LegislatureBostelman priority bill
2020-02-05LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 13, 2020
2020-01-21LegislatureReferred to Health and Human Services Committee
2020-01-15LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback