NE LB1001 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB1001 amended into LB867 by AM2767
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB1001 amended into LB867 by AM2767
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for a migratory waterfowl hunting season for veterans
Title
Provide for a migratory waterfowl hunting season for veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1001 amended into LB867 by AM2767 |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-02-12 | Legislature | DeKay name added |
2024-02-06 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 14, 2024 |
2024-01-25 | Legislature | Lippincott name added |
2024-01-10 | Legislature | von Gillern name added |
2024-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2024-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |