NE LB1001 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for a review of the financing of schools
Title
Provide for a review of the financing of schools
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Briese [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-02-14 | Legislature | Lowe name added |
2018-02-06 | Legislature | Lindstrom name added |
2018-02-05 | Legislature | Stinner name added |
2018-02-01 | Legislature | Hansen name added |
2018-01-31 | Legislature | Morfeld name added |
2018-01-26 | Legislature | Watermeier name added |
2018-01-26 | Legislature | Baker name added |
2018-01-26 | Legislature | Ebke name added |
2018-01-26 | Legislature | McDonnell name added |
2018-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2018 |
2018-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2018-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34358 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB1001.pdf |