NE LB10 | 2021 | 107th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-30 - Indefinitely Postponed pursuant to Rule 9, Sec. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-30 - Indefinitely Postponed pursuant to Rule 9, Sec. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Set boundaries of legislative districts
Title
Set boundaries of legislative districts
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Linehan [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-30 | Legislature | Indefinitely Postponed pursuant to Rule 9, Sec. 8 |
2021-09-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 17, 2021 |
2021-09-13 | Legislature | Referred to Redistricting Committee |
2021-09-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |